+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-002-000
- Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- To Income Tax Subcommittee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 35 ILCS 5/212
- 35 ILCS 5/212.1 new
- 820 ILCS 170/5 - from Ch. 48, par. 2755
+ − Vote
March 25, 2021: HB2792 - Income Tax Subcommittee
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor