+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0132
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 18, 2017
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-012-000
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Remains in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 003-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- To Business Licenses Subcommittee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
In provisions concerning definitions, provides that "multi-state licensing system" means a web-based platform that allows licensure applicants to submit their applications and renewals to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation online (rather than a third-party administrator of licensure that processes applications and renewals and maintains multi-state records).
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 225 ILCS 425/2 - from Ch. 111, par. 2002
- 225 ILCS 425/2.5 new -
- 225 ILCS 425/4.6 new -
- 225 ILCS 425/5 - from Ch. 111, par. 2008
- 225 ILCS 425/7 - from Ch. 111, par. 2010
- 225 ILCS 425/8a - from Ch. 111, par. 2011a
- 225 ILCS 425/8c - from Ch. 111, par. 2011c
- 225 ILCS 425/9.22 - from Ch. 111, par. 2034
- 225 ILCS 425/13.1 - from Ch. 111, par. 2038.1
- 225 ILCS 425/13.2 - from Ch. 111, par. 2038.2
- 225 ILCS 425/16 -
- 225 ILCS 425/17 -
- 225 ILCS 425/27 -
- 225 ILCS 425/30 -
+ − Votes (5)
May 23, 2017: HB2783 - Third Reading
May 3, 2017: HB2783 - Licensed Activities and Pensions
April 5, 2017: HB2783 - Third Reading
March 22, 2017: HB2783 - Business Licenses Subcommittee
March 22, 2017: HB2783 - Business & Occupational Licenses
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor