+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On November 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
On November 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 27, 2018
- Second Reading
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 13, 2018
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-047-000
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 008-005-000
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 5/901 - from Ch. 120, par. 9-901
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2017: HB0278 - Third Reading
February 8, 2017: HB0278 - Cities & Villages
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor