+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 12, 2011 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0332
- Effective Date August 12, 2011
- Governor Approved
On June 15, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2011
- Second Reading
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On April 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-005-000
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael W. Tryon
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Act. Authorizes the payment of license fees by credit card or business check. Decreases the civil penalties that must be paid for failing to timely submit the required license fees. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2011: HB2777 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 17, 2011
April 15, 2011: HB2777 - Third Reading - Friday, April 15, 2011
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor