+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- To Wages & Rates Subcommittee
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 105/4.02 - from Ch. 23, par. 6104.02
+ − Sponsors (72)
Type:
Primary Sponsor