+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Remains in Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
On March 11, 2003 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Osterman
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Deletes a provision requiring that a revocation of a signature on a petition be filed within 20 days from the filing of the petition with the clerk to be effective.
+ − Statute Amended
- 235 ILCS 5/9-2 - from Ch. 43, par. 167
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor