+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell
+ − Statute Amended
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-1 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor