+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II