+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- To Public Benefits Subcommittee
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor