+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Arrived in House
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2008
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 28, 2008
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary Criminal Law; 007-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2008
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Constance A. Howard
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Constance A. Howard
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 18, 2008
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Constance A. Howard
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the supervising officer of a parolee or releasee shall request the Department of Corrections to issue a parole violation warrant, and the Department shall issue a parole violation warrant, under specified circumstances. Includes in such circumstances when the parolee or releasee is charged with domestic battery, stalking, aggravated stalking, violation of an order of protection, or any offense that would require registration as a sex offender under the Sex Offender Registration Act.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that as a condition of parole or mandatory supervised release, the subject of the parole or mandatory supervised release shall report all orders of protection issued against the parolee or releasee to an agent of the Department of Corrections as soon as possible after service of the order of protection upon the parolee or releasee but in no event later than 24 hours after service of the order of protection. Provides that the supervising officer of a parolee or releasee shall request the Department of Corrections to issue a parole violation warrant, and the Department shall issue a parole violation warrant, under specified circumstances. Includes in such circumstances when the parolee or releasee is charged with domestic battery, stalking, aggravated stalking, violation of an order of protection, or any offense that would require registration as a sex offender under the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides that neither the Governor nor any agency or agency head under the jurisdiction of the Governor has any rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/3-6-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-6-1