+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Assigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 235 ILCS 5/1-3.35 -
- 235 ILCS 5/5-1 - from Ch. 43, par. 115
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor