+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (58)
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-005-000
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emily McAsey
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- Correctional Note Filed
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ron Sandack
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-003-000
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 5 ILCS 375/6.11 -
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1069.3 -
- 65 ILCS 5/10-4-2.3 -
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.3f -
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.23 new -
- 215 ILCS 125/5-3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1411.2
- 215 ILCS 130/4003 - from Ch. 73, par. 1504-3
- 215 ILCS 165/10 - from Ch. 32, par. 604
- 305 ILCS 5/5-16.8 -
+ − Votes (2)
May 24, 2016: HFA0003 - Human Services
March 18, 2015: HB2743 - Human Services - Mar 18, 2015
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor