+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 12, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0514
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Filed Without Signature
On June 5, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2003
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 016-001-000
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Wirsing
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Delgado
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2003: HB0274 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 07, 2003
April 2, 2003: HB0274 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 02, 2003
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor