+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-007-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. Provides that schools shall be maintained to accommodate all person in the school district who will attain the age of 5 years on or before December 1 (instead of September 1).
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/34-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-1
- 105 ILCS 5/10-20.12 - from Ch. 122, par. 10-20.12