+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0267
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 21, 2019: HB2720 - Third Reading
May 1, 2019: HB2720 - Higher Education
March 27, 2019: HB2720 - Third Reading
March 6, 2019: HB2720 - Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor