+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-000-002
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan