+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 23, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0749
- Effective Date July 23, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 18, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2008
- Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 007-000-000
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
On May 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Bio-Technology Committee; 005-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Bio-Technology Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Bio-Technology Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Bio-Technology Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 12, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ronald A. Wait
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that each State agency that maintains an Internet website may, subject to appropriation, (instead of must) include hypertext links to websites containing information on ethanol and biodiesel fuels. Provides that the websites of the following entities may be linked on State agency websites: (i) Illinois agricultural or health related organizations; and (ii) national agricultural, renewable fuel, or health related organizations (instead of (i) the National Ethanol Vehicle Coalition; and (ii) the National Biodiesel Board).
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2008: HB0271 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2008
April 19, 2007: HB0271 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 19, 2007
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor