+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Medicaid Reform, Family & Children Services Committee; 009-000-000
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 067-040-004
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Medicaid Reform, Family & Children Services Committee
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
March 10, 2009: HB2691 - Tuesday, March 10, 2009
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor