+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
- Session Sine Die
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 10, 2021
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 006-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 008-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Assigned to Financial Institutions
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-033-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 014-003-000
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 002
Provides that "student loan servicer" or "servicer" includes persons or entities acting on behalf of the State Treasurer.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Creates the Student Investment Account Act (currently, the Student Loan Investment Act). Adds a provision concerning the use of earnings from the Student Investment Account. Modifies provisions concerning the establishment, operation, and administration of the Student Investment Account by the State Treasurer, and adds requirements concerning income share agreements and income share agreement providers. Allows the State Treasurer to enter into income share agreements with participants (currently, borrowers) and to facilitate such arrangements between participants and eligible income share agreement providers (currently, lenders). Provides that the State Treasurer or his or her designee (currently, only State Treasurer) may charge and collect insurance premiums under the Act. Provides for the creation and use of specified Funds as non-appropriated separate and apart trust funds in the State Treasury (currently, Funds to be held outside of the State Treasury with the State Treasurer as custodian). Amends the Student Loan Servicing Rights Act. Provides that the term "student loan servicer" shall not include, among other entities, the State Treasurer (currently, the State Treasurer and its agents when the agents are acting on the State Treasurer's behalf). Modifies and defines terms. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- New Act -
- 15 ILCS 520/22.5 - from Ch. 130, par. 41a
- 110 ILCS 992/1-5 -