+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
- Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Chapin Rose
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor