+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
- Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- To Property Tax Subcommittee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2019: HB2677 - Property Tax Subcommittee
March 28, 2019: HB2677 - Revenue & Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor