+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 18, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0576
- Effective Date August 18, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-013-000
- Verified
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009
- Do Pass Environment; 005-004-000
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-036-000
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elaine Nekritz
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the State Finance Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Trucking and Environmental Education Fund is not subject to sweeps. Provides that a person convicted of excessive idling shall be fined $90 for a first offense (rather than $250). Also changes the distribution formula for violations for excessive idling.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the State Finance Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Trucking and Environmental Education Fund is not subject to sweeps. Provides that a person convicted of excessive idling shall be fined $90 for a first offense (rather than $250). Also changes the distribution formula for violations for excessive idling.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 30 ILCS 105/5.719 new -
- 625 ILCS 5/11-1429 -
- 705 ILCS 105/27.5 - from Ch. 25, par. 27.5
- 705 ILCS 105/27.6 -
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2009: HB2664 - Third Reading - Friday, May 22, 2009
April 3, 2009: HB2664 - Third Reading - Friday, April 03, 2009
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor