+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On August 14, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0105
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2018
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-001
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
- Do Pass Education; 013-000-000
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-020-000
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.71 - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.71
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.71a - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.71a
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.6 - from Ch. 122, par. 10-22.6
- 225 ILCS 10/5.10 new -
+ − Votes (4)
May 19, 2017: HB2663 - Third Reading
May 2, 2017: HB2663 - Education
March 29, 2017: HB2663 - Third Reading
March 15, 2017: HB2663 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor