+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On November 19, 2003 in the House:
- Restored Items Became Law 93-0115
On November 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Restore Item/Reduction - Senate Passed 055-000-001; Page 15, Lines 27-29.
On November 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Restore Item/Reduction Veto Sen. Patrick Welch; Page 15, Lines 27-29.
On November 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Item/Reduction Veto November 18, 2003
On November 5, 2003 in the House:
- Override Reduction Veto - House Passed 114-002-001; Motion #1 - PG 15-LN 27-29
On November 4, 2003 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Reduction Veto Rep. Michael J. Madigan; Motion #1 - PG 15-LN 27-29
On October 23, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Item/Reduction Veto November 4, 2003
On July 9, 2003 in the House:
- Governor Item/Reduction Veto PA 93-0115
- Effective Date July 9, 2003
On June 20, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2003 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Madigan; Motion #1
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 066-051-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations I
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Patrick Welch
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick Welch
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Appropriations I; 008-005-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Welch
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-013-001
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
On May 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2003
- Second Reading
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2003
- Do Pass Appropriations I; 010-000-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations I
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 069-043-005
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 010-002-002
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ricca Slone
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Makes appropriations to the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2004. Effective July 1, 2003.
+ − Votes (5)
November 19, 2003: HB2663 - Motion - Wednesday, November 19, 2003
November 5, 2003: SFA0001 - Motion - Wednesday, November 05, 2003
May 23, 2003: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Friday, May 23, 2003
May 22, 2003: HB2663 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 22, 2003
April 3, 2003: HB2663 - Thursday, April 03, 2003
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor