+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Makes the provisions of the amendatory Act applicable to any person who is contracted with the Department on Aging and works on the development or implementation (rather than the development and implementation) of adult protective services. Requires the Department to implement (rather than develop and implement) the dementia training program.