+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-002-000
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
- Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-002
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
- First Reading
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (4)
May 28, 2019: SFA0001 - Human Services
May 7, 2019: HB2656 - Human Services
April 9, 2019: HB2656 - Third Reading
March 27, 2019: HB2656 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor