+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 20, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0443
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2021
- Second Reading
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2021
- Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-036-001
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 011-005-000
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1069.3 -
- 65 ILCS 5/10-4-2.3 -
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.43 new -
- 215 ILCS 125/5-3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1411.2
+ − Votes (4)
May 27, 2021: HB2653
May 12, 2021: HB2653 - Insurance
April 22, 2021: HB2653 - Third Reading
March 22, 2021: HB2653 - Insurance
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor