+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 18, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0575
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 18, 2009
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-000-000
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009
- Second Reading
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 011-000-000
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Millner
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. John J. Millner
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the amendatory Act shall not be construed to create a private right of action.