+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0480
- Effective Date August 23, 2019
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2019
- Second Reading
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
- Correctional Note Filed
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Creates the Task Force on Children of Incarcerated Parents. Provides for membership of the Task Force. Provides that the Office of the Lieutenant Governor shall provide administrative and technical support to the Task Force and shall be responsible for administering its operations, appointing a chairperson, and ensuring that the requirements of the Task Force are met. Provides that the Task Force shall have all appointments made within 30 days of the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that the first meeting shall be held no later than August 1, 2019. Provides that the Task Force shall review available research, best practices, and effective interventions to formulate recommendations. Provides that the Task Force shall submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly and the Governor by December 31, 2019. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.