+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On July 18, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley