+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
+ − Statute Amended
- 70 ILCS 520/1 - from Ch. 85, par. 6151
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor