+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- To Special Subcommittee (INS)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Statute Amended
- 215 ILCS 5/236 - from Ch. 73, par. 848
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor