+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 018-011-000
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 5 ILCS 100/5-45.8 new -
- 20 ILCS 655/5.5 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 609.1
- 20 ILCS 3855/1-10 -
- 20 ILCS 3855/1-56 -
- 20 ILCS 3855/1-75 -
- 220 ILCS 5/16-107.5 -
- 220 ILCS 5/16-107.6 -
- 220 ILCS 5/16-107.7 new -
- 220 ILCS 5/16-108 -
- 220 ILCS 5/16-111.5 -