+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 23, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 23, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0120
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
+ − Statute Amended
- 755 ILCS 5/11a-4 - from Ch. 110 1/2, par. 11a-4
+ − Votes (5)
May 29, 2021: HB0263
May 18, 2021: HB0263 - Judiciary
April 16, 2021: HB0263
April 16, 2021: HB0263 - Third Reading
March 2, 2021: HB0263 - Judiciary - Civil
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor