+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000
- Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert F. Flider
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor