+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled
- Motion Prevailed
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Amy Grant
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Grant
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- New Act -
- 815 ILCS 505/2Z - from Ch. 121 1/2, par. 262Z
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor