+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-011-025
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Wyvetter H. Younge
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Wyvetter H. Younge
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee; 008-000-000
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Wyvetter H. Younge
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- New Act -
- 20 ILCS 3805/10 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 310