+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 3, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1042
- Sent to the Governor
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Feigenholtz
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 044-012-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ann M. Williams
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 097-010-002
- House Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2022
- Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Assigned to Transportation
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John Connor
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 103-001-000
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that until July 1, 2023, images from cameras are exempt from disclosure. Amends the Expressway Camera Act. Provides that the program conducted by the Illinois State Police, the Illinois Department of Transportation, and the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority to increase the amount of cameras along the expressways in Cook County shall also increase cameras along Jean-Baptiste Pointe DuSable Lake Shore Drive. Requires details about the program objectives, counties where the program is operational, and policies under which the program operates to be made publicly available and posted online within 90 days of the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that a law enforcement agency may use images from an expressway camera to investigate vehicular hijacking, aggravated vehicular hijacking, terrorism, motor vehicle theft, or any forcible felony, including, but not limited to, offenses involving the use of a firearm (instead of only an offense involving the use of a firearm) and to detect highway conditions and facilitate highway safety and incident management. Adds provisions concerning retention of images from cameras, reporting requirements, and prosecutorial jurisdiction. Relocates the definition of "expressway" and defines terms. Changes the Act repeal date to July 1, 2025 (instead of July 1, 2023). Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 625 ILCS 5/2-130 new
- 5 ILCS 140/7.5
- 605 ILCS 140/3 new
- 605 ILCS 140/5
- 605 ILCS 140/90