+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
- Session Sine Die
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mike Jacobs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary Criminal Law; 006-003-001
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 13, 2009
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2007
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary Criminal Law; 006-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Postponed - Judiciary Criminal Law
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 21, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandy Cole
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides that when a sex offender registers with the appropriate law enforcement agency, he or she shall provide the law enforcement agency with all e-mail addresses, instant messaging identities, chat room identities, and other Internet communications identities that the sex offender uses or plans to use, all Uniform Resource Locators (URLs) registered or used by the sex offender, and all blogs and other Internet sites maintained by the sex offender or to which the sex offender has uploaded any content or posted any messages or information. Amends the Sex Offender Community Notification Law. Provides for disclosure of such information to the public. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 730 ILCS 150/3 - from Ch. 38, par. 223
- 730 ILCS 152/120 -