+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 11, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0073
- Effective Date January 1, 2018
- Governor Approved
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
- Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
- Arrive in Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-003-000
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick