+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 27, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 27, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0169
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-005-000
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-028-000
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 012-000-004
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that for a person married in any county in the State, the county clerk shall issue a new marriage certificate when it receives legal documentation indicating that one of the parties listed on the certificate has legally changed names. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 28, 2021: HB2590 - Third Reading
May 26, 2021: HB2590 - Executive
April 22, 2021: HB2590 - Third Reading
April 21, 2021: HFA0001 - Judiciary - Civil
March 16, 2021: HB2590 - Judiciary - Civil
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor