+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 22, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0231
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
On June 25, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
On May 23, 2003 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John A. Fritchey; Motion #1
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Silverstein
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Financial Institutions; 006-000-000
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Financial Institutions; 009-000-000
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 2, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Consumer Protection Committee
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John A. Fritchey
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes all. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Makes substantively the same changes as in the Bill but makes the provisions operative on January 1,2005 and eliminates the special liability provisions.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes all. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Makes substantively the same changes as in the Bill but makes the provisions operative on January 1,2005 and eliminates the special liability provisions.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (3)
May 27, 2003: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Tuesday, May 27, 2003
May 16, 2003: HB0259 - Third Reading - Friday, May 16, 2003
March 26, 2003: HB0259 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 26, 2003
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor