+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William Davis
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 19, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 14, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statutes Amended (29)
- 305 ILCS 5/10-10 - from Ch. 23, par. 10-10
- 705 ILCS 35/4.4 new -
- 705 ILCS 405/1-5 - from Ch. 37, par. 801-5
- 705 ILCS 405/2-20 - from Ch. 37, par. 802-20
- 705 ILCS 405/2-23 - from Ch. 37, par. 802-23
- 705 ILCS 405/3-21 - from Ch. 37, par. 803-21
- 705 ILCS 405/3-24 - from Ch. 37, par. 803-24
- 705 ILCS 405/4-18 - from Ch. 37, par. 804-18
- 705 ILCS 405/4-21 - from Ch. 37, par. 804-21
- 725 ILCS 5/112A-7 - from Ch. 38, par. 112A-7
- 725 ILCS 5/112A-14 - from Ch. 38, par. 112A-14
- 750 ILCS 5/307 new -
- 750 ILCS 5/404.05 new -
- 750 ILCS 5/411.5 new -
- 750 ILCS 5/452.5 new -
- 750 ILCS 5/510 - from Ch. 40, par. 510
- 750 ILCS 5/606 - from Ch. 40, par. 606
- 750 ILCS 5/103 rep. -
- 750 ILCS 10/8.5 new -
- 750 ILCS 10/8.10 new -
- 750 ILCS 22/301 -
- 750 ILCS 28/40 -
- 750 ILCS 30/7.5 new -
- 750 ILCS 30/9 - from Ch. 40, par. 2209
- 750 ILCS 45/13 - from Ch. 40, par. 2513
- 750 ILCS 45/14 - from Ch. 40, par. 2514
- 750 ILCS 50/5.5 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/206 - from Ch. 40, par. 2312-6
- 750 ILCS 60/214 - from Ch. 40, par. 2312-14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor