+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
+ − Statute Amended
- 40 ILCS 5/13-208 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 13-208
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2019: HB2582 - Third Reading
March 7, 2019: HB2582 - Personnel & Pensions
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor