+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 2, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0852
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 2, 2004
On June 3, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Dave Sullivan
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2004
- Second Reading
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2004
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 21, 2003
- First Reading
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Susana Mendoza
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2004: HB2582 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 05, 2004
March 19, 2003: HB2582 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 19, 2003
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor