+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/30-14.2 - from Ch. 122, par. 30-14.2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor