+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy
+ − Statute Amended
- 55 ILCS 5/3-6002 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-6002
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor