+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 015-000-000
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 510 ILCS 70/7.1 - from Ch. 8, par. 707.1