+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- To Civil Procedure & Tort Liability Subcommittee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-010-000
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Vote
March 16, 2021: HB2571 - Judiciary - Civil
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor