+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 10, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0042
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 10, 2007
On June 13, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2007
- Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 23, 2007
- Referred to Rules
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 012-000-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 11, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough
+ − Statute Amended
- 775 ILCS 5/3-106 - from Ch. 68, par. 3-106
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2007: HB0257 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 15, 2007
February 22, 2007: HB0257 - Third Reading - Thursday, February 22, 2007
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor